This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/22/2022 at 22:32:09 (UTC).

Infinity Park, LLC vs. Demond Stanley AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Infinity Park, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Demond Stanley AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3612

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Infinity Park, LLC

2900 Matlock Road

Arlington, TX 76015

Defendant

Stanley, Demond

Arlington, TX 76015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher S Ferguson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEmailed: DISMISSAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal at Trial Without Prejudice Entered: BOTH PARTIES APPEARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAttorney Contacted Court: ATTY ON ZOOM WAITING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D) : Result: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXE'T 12/7/22 VIA ALT SRVC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEVICTION: Stanley, Demond: Served: 12/07/2022; Returned: 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-11395: Infinity Park, LLC: (108.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Infinity Park, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 129.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Infinity Park, LLC v Demond Stanley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S Ferguson