This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/29/2021 at 14:33:47 (UTC).

INDIAN CREEK PLNDV TX LLC vs. MANUEL DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 INDIAN CREEK PLNDV TX LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MANUEL DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5026

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INDIAN CREEK PLNDV TX LLC

5400 Parker Henderson Rd

Ft Worth, TX 76119

Defendant

DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ, MANUEL

Fort Worth, TX 76119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $996.20; Awarded To: INDIAN CREEK PLNDV TX LLC; Awarded Against: MANUEL DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: 996.20,BR+CC, BOND 2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: RTN 11-03-21,EXECUTED 10-28-21,CRT DATE 11-04-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ, MANUEL: Served: 10/28/2021; Returned: 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: & pltf hearing ltr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: DE JESUS RODRIGUEZ, MANUEL: Returned Unserved 10/26/2021; Returned: 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2021-04446: ParkLand Ventures Inc. and Subsidiaries: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff INDIAN CREEK PLNDV TX LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIAN CREEK PLNDV TX LLC is a litigant