Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/27/2020 at 14:46:40 (UTC).

In the Matter of Guardianship of Genevive Green, an Incapacitated Person

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 In the Matter of Guardianship of Genevive Green, an Incapacitated Person was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********89-2

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Hollins, Jill Mandy Green

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Green, Genevive

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Private Home

3625 Oaktree Cir., Apt. #1605

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Arnier, Jeffery C

Fort Worth, TX 76196

Vinning, Yvonne

Patterson, LA 70392

McKinney, Tammy

Pensacola, FL 32506

Colbert, Walter

Carencro, LA 70520

Green, Carolyn

Yakima, WA 98909

Whitmill, Julie

Corpus Christi, TX 78412

Colbert, Spencer

Carencro, LA 70520

Green-Ruiz, Felicia

San Antonio, TX 78249

Wilson, Yvonne

Morgan City, LA 70380

Washington, Pamela

Patterson, LA 70392

Allen, Annette

Houston, TX 77047

Guardian Ad Litem

Parvin, Christopher J.

Dallas, TX 75202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Martin A. Rechnitzer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index #22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Yvonne Wilson; Wilson, Yvonne: Served: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Walter Colbert; Colbert, Walter: Served: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Spencer Colbert; Colbert, Spencer: Served: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Pamela Washington; Washington, Pamela: Served: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Tammy McKinney; McKinney, Tammy: Served: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Carolyn Green; Green, Carolyn: Served: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Felicia Ruiz; Green-Ruiz, Felicia: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Julie Whitmill; Whitmill, Julie: Returned Unserved 01/29/2020; Returned: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation - Certified Mail: Yvonne Vinning; Vinning, Yvonne: Served: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Public Notice: Served: 07/18/2019; Returned: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketApplication for Appt of Guardian of Person & Estate Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCourt Visitor Report - Initial Proposed Ward Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docket306 Notice Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Index #5: 469-607-4503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Visitor Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketPhysician's Certificate and Medical Exam Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Investigator Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketSuggestion of Need 1102.003 Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Private Home is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin A. Rechnitzer