This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:38:41 (UTC).

In The Matter of Guardianship of Sharon Desimone, An Incapacitated Person

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 In The Matter of Guardianship of Sharon Desimone, An Incapacitated Person was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04-2

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

Deane, Alicia

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Not Classified By Court

Desimone, Sharon

Fort Worth, TX 76116

The Ridglea Senior Living

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Aaron J. Shutt

Not Classified By Court Attorney

L. Stephen Franscini, V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index # 6: Original Answer of Proposed Ward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 5: 817-926-2505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Visitor Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-132106: Deane, Alicia: (340.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Deane, Alicia; Total Financial Assessment: 477.00; Total Payments and Credits: 477.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 477.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCitation - Personal: WARD; Desimone, Sharon: Served: 04/28/2022; Returned: 04/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 05-09-22; Public Notice: Served: 04/27/2022; Returned: 05/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: to Attorney Re Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketPhysician's Certificate and Medical Exam Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketApplication for Appt of Guardian of Person & Estate Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less