Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/01/2021 at 06:30:53 (UTC).

In the Matter of Guardianship of Amanda J. Kawasmi, an Incapacitated Person

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Matter of Guardianship of Amanda J Kawasmi, an Incapacitated Person was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********69-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Kawasmi, Amanda J.

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Hart, Elizabeth

Applicants

Kawasmi, Sheila K.

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Kawasmi, Jawdat O.

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Bhavik P. Amaidas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCourt Visitor Report - Initial Proposed Ward Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotification of Guardian Registration with JBCC Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketPhysician's Certificate and Medical Exam Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115895: Kawasmi, Jawdat O.: (109.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 109.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCitation - Personal: WARD; Kawasmi, Amanda J.: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCitation: Return Date 05-03-21; Public Notice: Served: 04/19/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion for Guardian with JBCC Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion for Guardian with JBCC Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCourt Investigator Report Index # 6: Jeffery C. Arnier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115078: Kawasmi, Jawdat O: (232.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Kawasmi, Jawdat O.; Total Financial Assessment: 341.00; Total Payments and Credits: 341.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 232.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Visitor Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPhysician's Certificate and Medical Exam Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 4: Email to Attorney Requesting Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 3: Akram J. Kawasmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 2: Amer J. Kawasmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Appt of Guardian of Person Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less