This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 07:02:48 (UTC).

In The Matter of Guardianship of Aafreen Ali, An Incapacitated Person

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 In The Matter of Guardianship of Aafreen Ali, An Incapacitated Person was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28-2

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicants

Ali, Amjad

Colleyville, TX 76034

Ali, Zohar N.

Colleyville, TX 76034

Not Classified By Court

Ali, Aafreen

Colleyville, TX 76034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Richard D. O'Connor, JR

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Robert J. Fitzgerald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Notice 1051.104 Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Completion for Guardian with JBCC Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Completion for Guardian with JBCC Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 11: 817-806-4501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 7: Azfar Ali

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 5: Filing Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCourt Investigator Report Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Visitor Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-133311: ALI, AAFREEN: (332.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Incapacitated Person Adult Ali, Aafreen; Total Financial Assessment: 469.00; Total Payments and Credits: 469.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 469.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Public Notice: Served: 05/23/2022; Returned: 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Ali, Aafreen: Served: 05/23/2022; Returned: 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: to Attorney Re: Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPhysician's Certificate and Medical Exam Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketApplication for Appt of Guardian of Person Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Fitzgerald