Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/17/2021 at 06:35:25 (UTC).

In the Estate of Zhila Shahmohammadi, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Zhila Shahmohammadi, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********74-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicants

Shahmohammadi, Hamid

Shahmohammadi, Hamid Also Known As S., Hamid

North Richland Hills, TX 76132

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Shahmohammadi, Zhila

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Dustin R Baker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: July 23, 2021 at 10:00am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/12/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115003: Shahmohammadi, Hamid: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Shahmohammadi, Hamid; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2: With Attached Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baker, Dustin R.