Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:15:39 (UTC).

In the Estate of William P. Hallman, JR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of William P Hallman, JR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********56-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hallman, William P., JR

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Smith, Mary H. Formerly Known As Hallman, Mary Susanna

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Phillip W. McCrury

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email Mccrury@kellyhart.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Probate Of Will Hearing; (10:20 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) ; Per Attorney; Email phil.mccrury@kellyhart.com joann.moore@kellyhart.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114694: Smith, Mary H.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #9: Hearing Setting Letter 04/19/2021 at 10:20 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index #8: Declination to Serve for Nancy L. Hallman re Estate of William P. Hallman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index #7: Declination to Serve for Lee Caroline Hallman re Estate of William P. Hallman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCodicil Index #6: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113688: Smith, Mary H.: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Smith, Mary H.; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCodicil - Copy Index #3: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $10 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip W. McCrury