Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/19/2021 at 19:33:36 (UTC).

In the Estate of William John Zielinski, Deceased

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 In the Estate of William John Zielinski, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Brooke U and Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09-2

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Brooke U

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Applicant and Administrator

Zielinski, Bryann

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Zielinski, William John

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Interested Party

Zielinski, Brandy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Administrator Attorney

H. Dean Owen, JR

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Robert J. Fitzgerald

Interested Party Attorney

Rashelle Diane Fetty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketBond - Corporate Surety Index #46: $55,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProposed Bond Index #45: $55,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Statement of Heirship Facts Index #44: George Zielinski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Statement of Heirship Facts Index #43: Cory Crockett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOath Index #42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Miscellaneous - Probate Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) ; Per Attorney; Zoom Objection to Representation emails deanowen21@gamil.com rashelle@thefettyfirm.com robert@wtflaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge: Received Countersign order 10-21-2020 @ 8:33 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge: Received Countersign order 10-21-2020 @ 8:33 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) ; Per Attorney; Zoom emails deanowen21@gamil.com rashelle@thefettyfirm.com robert@wtflaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #6: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 05-25-20; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 05/21/2020; Returned: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 05-25-20; Public Notice: Served: 05/14/2020; Returned: 05/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-102659: Zielinski, Bryann: (409.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Zielinski, Bryann; Total Financial Assessment: 417.00; Total Payments and Credits: 417.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index #1: PD $4 JF, PD $20 for Letters, PD $129 PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rashelle Fetty