Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/03/2021 at 06:35:52 (UTC).

In the Estate of William Douglas Arbogast, JR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of William Douglas Arbogast, JR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********42-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Decedent

Arbogast, William Douglas, JR

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Arbogast, Jackie Aderholt

Joshua, TX 76058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Kathleen F. Lehrmann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (11:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn) : KFLehrmann@aol.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115343: Arbogast, Jackie Aderholt: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: 04/30/2021 at 11:15 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113648: Arbogast, Jackie Aderholt: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Arbogast, Jackie Aderholt; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Paid $4 JF & $8 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen F. Lehrmann