Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/15/2021 at 06:09:50 (UTC).

In the Estate of Wellon Kirby Brenner, SR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 In the Estate of Wellon Kirby Brenner, SR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Decedent

Brenner, Wellon Kirby, SR

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Mitchell, Valli Lynne Brenner

Benbrook, TX 76126

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jimalee H. Splawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerMcGown, Quentin) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: March 16, 2021 at 10:30 AM via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111501: Mitchell, Valli: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Mitchell, Valli Lynne Brenner; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 01/18/2021; Public Notice: Served: 01/07/2021; Returned: 01/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimalee H. Splawn