Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 10:33:20 (UTC).

In the Estate of Waymon Linden Williams, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 In the Estate of Waymon Linden Williams, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicants and Executors

Williams, Joshua M.

Williams, Joshua M. Also Known As Williams, Joshua Michael

Springtown, TX 76082

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Williams, Waymon Linden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Kenneth N. Price

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0359256: Price, Kenneth N.: (12.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-106346: Williams, Joshua M.: (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOath Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #9: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #8: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (4:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : Result: Order Signed: via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 06/01/2020; Public Notice: Served: 05/18/2020; Returned: 05/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #5: Owes JF & Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment/Order Index #3: granting Entry into Safe Deposit Box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketApplication to Examine Documents or Safe Deposit Box Index #2: First Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-101816: WILLIAMS, JOSHUA: (237.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Williams, Joshua M.; Total Financial Assessment: 281.00; Total Payments and Credits: 281.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 237.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketApplication to Examine Documents or Safe Deposit Box Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth N. Price