This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/29/2020 at 08:20:32 (UTC).

In the Estate of Walter Scott Patterson, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 In the Estate of Walter Scott Patterson, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Patterson, Barbara

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Squyres, Cynthia Patterson

Clifton, TX 76634

Mata, Jeannie Patterson

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Patterson, Jody Ray

Abilene, TX 79601

Mata, Jeannie Patterson Also Known As Mata, Jeannie

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Squyres, Cynthia Patterson Also Known As Squyres, Cynthia Also Known As Squyres, Cynthia Ann

Clifton, TX 76634

Patterson, Jody Ray Also Known As Patterson, Jody

Abilene, TX 79601

Decedent

Patterson, Walter Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0355474: Patterson, Barbara: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Patterson, Walter Scott; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/23/2019; Public Notice: Served: 12/11/2019; Returned: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less