Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 06:35:32 (UTC).

In the Estate of Walter Louise Huzarevich, III, Deceased

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 In the Estate of Walter Louise Huzarevich, III, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23-2

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Huzarevich, Walter Louise, III

Applicants

Huzarevich, Walter

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Huzarevich, Walter L.

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Administrator

Huzarevich, Walter L. Also Known As Huzarevich, Walter Louis, JR

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Interested Party

Huzarevich, Raelyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Michael G. Appleman

Applicant and Administrator Attorneys

Douglas W. Wright

David C. Bakutis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge: Received 3-30-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Party Index #28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0361548: Huzarevich, Walter L.: (26.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge: Received from countersign queue 12-29-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #26: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge: Received Counter Signed 12/22/2020 @ 11:10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #25

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAmended Appl for Indep Admin & To Determine Heirship Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index #6: Cheryl Huzarevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw As Counsel Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index #3: 817-877-2803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMotion Index #2: to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-107308: Huzarevich, Walter: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Huzarevich, Walter L.; Total Financial Assessment: 417.00; Total Payments and Credits: 417.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 9/27/20; Public Notice: Served: 09/15/2020; Returned: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin Intestate 401.003 Index #1: Owes $2 JF Owes for Letters Pd $2JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis