Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/29/2018 at 06:35:50 (UTC).

In the Estate of Vivian Annett Warix, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Vivian Annett Warix, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant

Swanson, Candice Lynn

Hurst, TX 76054

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Warix, Vivian Annett

Bedford, TX 76021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorneys

Steven E Pirtle

Steven E. Pirtle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#10: Comp. Aff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (2:45 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#8: Re: To Original Will, First Codicil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Codicil Doc ID#7: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Codicil - Copy Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: PD $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79677: Swanson, Candice Lynn: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Swanson, Candice Lynn; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Pirtle