Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/09/2021 at 06:48:42 (UTC).

In the Estate of Vida Odett Jeffrey, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 In the Estate of Vida Odett Jeffrey, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Jeffrey, Pamela Ann

Keller, TX 76262

Decedent

Jeffrey, Vida Odett

Keller, TX 76262

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Jocelyn L. Irby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0363297: Irby, Jocelyn L.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index # 11: Jay Travis Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7: No Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McGown, Quentin) : via zoom / declination needed from 1IE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 6: and Waiver- Terry Gross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-116194: Jeffrey, Pamela Ann: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: May 26, 2021 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/05/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/24/2021; Returned: 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114691: Jeffrey, Pamela Ann: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Jeffrey, Pamela Ann; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jocelyn L. Irby