Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/27/2021 at 06:11:10 (UTC).

In the Estate of Victor L. Kirven, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 In the Estate of Victor L Kirven, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Kirven, Victor L.

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Spead, Twaneil

Irving, TX 75062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Michael G. Appleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111559: Kirven, Victor L.: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder for Emergency Intervention Index #9: Modified-- $5,022 to be Paid from the Registry 2018-GD00301-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside Prior Order Index #8: Order on Application for Emergency Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Modify Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #6: RE Filing of Proposed Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMotion to Modify Index #5: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Application Hearing; (9:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) ; Per Attorney; via zoom/Emergency intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111407: Kirven, Victor L.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #4: for Payment of $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111367: Kirven, Victor L: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Kirven, Victor L.; Total Financial Assessment: 262.00; Total Payments and Credits: 262.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Public Notice: Served: 01/05/2021; Returned: 01/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #2: Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketApplication Requesting Emergency Intervention 152.001 Index #1: Owes $2 JF, Paid $24 Poster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • DocketOrder for Emergency Protective Order Index #10: **** Set Aside 01/04/2021****

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G. Appleman