Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 06:30:23 (UTC).

In the Estate of Vernon H. Runyan, Sr., Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Vernon H Runyan, Sr , Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Runyan, Vernon H., SR

Applicant

Runyan, Vernon H., JR

Pantego, TX 76013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Carolyn Dove

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index #7: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (2:40 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email carolyn.dove@thedovefirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: Hearing 3-23-21 @ 2:30 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113697: Runyan, Vernon H.: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Runyan, Vernon H., JR; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carolyn Dove