Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:07:23 (UTC).

In the Estate of Tera M. Crook, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Tera M Crook, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********52-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicants

REICHERT, ANITA

Arlington, TX 76012

Reichert, Anita Also Known As Phillips, Anita Ray Also Known As Reichert, Anita Ray

Arlington, TX 76012

Decedents

CROOK, TERA M

Arlington, TX 76012

Crook, Tera M.

Arlington, TX 76012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Deborah K. Hartley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (3:22 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113675: REICHERT, ANITA: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Reichert, Anita; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Paid $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah K. Hartley