This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/27/2020 at 13:28:48 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sylvia Sue Cate, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 In the Estate of Sylvia Sue Cate, Deceased was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Emrick, Diana

Fort Worth, TX 76135

Decedent

Cate, Sylvia Sue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Ronda S. Haynes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0356402: Haynes, Ronda S.: (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #8: w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOath Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-99560: Emrick, Diana: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-98346: Emrick, Diana: (262.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Emrick, Diana; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 262.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/23/2019; Public Notice: Served: 12/12/2019; Returned: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #3: Letter to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF, Pd $6 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less