Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/25/2021 at 06:07:25 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sylvia M. Harston, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Sylvia M Harston, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********53-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Harston, Gary B.

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Decedent

Harston, Sylvia M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Robert C. Stroup

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0362750: Stroup, Robert C.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Attorney Stroup, Robert C.; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #8: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOath Index #7: Do Not Mail letter, they will be picked up by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (9:10 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email robert@thestrouplawfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: 04/19/2021 at 9:10 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113676: Harston, Gary B.: (273.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Harston, Gary B.; Total Financial Assessment: 273.00; Total Payments and Credits: 273.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 273.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/02/2021; Returned: 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #2: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters, Pd $5 Non CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Stroup