Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/20/2018 at 05:08:38 (UTC).

In the Estate of Stella Austin, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 In the Estate of Stella Austin, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********99-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Applicant and Administrator

Austin, Kenneth

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Novak, Sheldon

Tucson, AZ 85705

Decedent

Austin, Stella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Administrator Attorney

Joseph D. Zopolsky

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Bronwyn Massey Scharar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • Order Extending Time to File Inventory & Appraisement Doc ID#25: Extended to 8-20-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Application for Extension of Time to File Inventory & App. Doc ID#24: 60 Day Extension - August 20, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Sworn Statement of Fees and Expenses Doc ID#23: w/attached Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Judgment Determining Heirship Doc ID#20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Order Appointing Independent Administrator Doc ID#19: without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Independent Admin with Determination of Heirship Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed: Notice of Depo w/Answers on file/202 Atty cert & Report of AAL filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Certificate Doc ID#17: 202.057-Daniel's consent is attached

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Application for Determination of Heirship Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Application for Indep Admin Intestate 401.003 Doc ID#1: Owes $4 JF and for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342504: Strain, Jonathan Charles: (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Strain, Jonathan Charles; Total Financial Assessment: 14.00; Total Payments and Credits: 14.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81076: Austin, Kenneth: (35.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79605: Austin, Kenneth: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Austin, Kenneth; Total Financial Assessment: 420.00; Total Payments and Credits: 420.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bronwyn Massey Scharar