Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/22/2021 at 01:25:33 (UTC).

In the Estate of Stanley Roy Hilton, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 In the Estate of Stanley Roy Hilton, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********42-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Claimant

Law Office of Roger Fuller

5757 Alpha Rd. Suite 221

Dallas, TX 75240

Decedent

Hilton, Stanley Roy

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Avants, Gregory L. Also Known As Avants, Gregory Lynn

Chandler, TX 75758

Interested Party

Maxwell, Suzanne Catherine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

ROGER FULLER

Applicant Attorney

Jimalee H. Splawn

Interested Party Attorney

MICHAEL VERNONE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Attorney Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Probate Of Will Hearing; (2:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) ; Other; via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index #8: General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #7: February 25, 2021 at 2:15 PM via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Attorney Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111335: Avants, Gregory L.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Avants, Gregory L.; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 1/11/21; Public Notice: Served: 12/31/2020; Returned: 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #4: Re: Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: PD $4 Jf PD $8 ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less