Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 06:09:19 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sharon Ann Critz, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Sharon Ann Critz, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Critz, Roger Allen

Westworth Village, TX 76114

Decedent

Critz, Sharon Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Michael S. Newman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketIndependent Adminstration With Will Annexed Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: May 11th, 2021 at 03:00pm via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113724: Critz, Roger Allen: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Critz, Roger Allen; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index #3: Jodi L. Hamilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Index #1: Owes $4 JF pd $12 ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Newman