Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2018 at 16:07:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of Shakuntala Devi Acharya, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 In the Estate of Shakuntala Devi Acharya, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Achaya, Badrr

Acharya, Badri Also Known As Achaya, Badri

Euless, TX 76040

Acharya, Subhash

Euless, TX 76040

Subedi, Sushma

Austin, TX 78759

Decedents

Acharya, Shakuntala Devi

Acharya, Shakuntala Devi Also Known As Acharya, Shakuntala

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#18: 1 SE & Order Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Order Approving Small Estate Affidavit Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Small Estate Affidavit Doc ID#14: Fourth Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Small Estate Affidavit Doc ID#13: Third Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Exhibit Doc ID#12: Cashier's Check - xx6548

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Exhibit Doc ID#11: Cashier's Check - xx6547

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Small Estate Affidavit Doc ID#10: Second Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#9: To: Mr. Archarya From: Probate Analyst Re: Amended Small Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Miscellaneous Document Doc ID#8: Safe Deposit Box Search Certification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Small Estate Affidavit Doc ID#7: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date: 01/08/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/28/2017; Returned: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#4: Filing Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Miscellaneous Document Doc ID#3: Marriage Registration Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Miscellaneous Document Doc ID#2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Small Estate Affidavit Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341166: Achaya, Badrr: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial Information: Distributee Acharya, Badri; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less