Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 06:13:28 (UTC).

In the Estate of Saturnino Saldana Lugo, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Saturnino Saldana Lugo, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********62-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Lugo, Saturnino Saldana

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Not Classified By Court

Saldana, Rosalba

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index #7: SEA and Order mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Small Estate Affidavit Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #4: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #3: Re: Affidavit Not Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0361981: Saldana, Rosalba: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Saldana, Rosalba; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less