Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/26/2021 at 06:46:05 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sandra Kay Snipes, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 In the Estate of Sandra Kay Snipes, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Snipes, Sandra Kay

Applicant

Snipes, Vernon Roger

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Kenneth N. Price

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0362701: Price, Kenneth N.: (17.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index #7: Issued a CC of Order and Will for pick up by -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index #5: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email thefirmprice@yahoo.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112211: SNIPES, VERNON ROGER: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Snipes, Vernon Roger; Total Financial Assessment: 275.00; Total Payments and Credits: 275.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 02/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 01/27/2021; Returned: 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth N. Price