Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/27/2021 at 06:18:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Samuel Jagoda, JR, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 In the Estate of Samuel Jagoda, JR, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are McGown, Quentin and Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

McGown, Quentin

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Jagoda, Dana Ruth

Fort Worth, TX 76109

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Jagoda, Samuel, JR

Fort Worth, TX 76109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Jimalee H. Splawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder Extending Time to File Inventory & Appraisement Index # 14: Extended to November 23, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Extension of Time to File Inventory & App. Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 9: w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (11:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: April 1, 2021 11:45 AM via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: April 23, 2021 at 2:00 PM via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113377: Jagoda, Dana Ruth: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Jagoda, Dana Ruth; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 02/25/2021; Returned: 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimalee H. Splawn