Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/22/2021 at 06:49:20 (UTC).

In Re: The Estate of R. V., A Minor

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In Re The Estate of R filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against , A Minor. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Minor

**Confidential**

Applicant

Van Voast, Charissa

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Decedent

Dunn, Daniel L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jason D Tomlin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketReceipt Index # 7: Court Exhibit Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDeputy Official Court Reporter Certificate Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 5: Appraisal of Real Property in Application for Sale of Minor's Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 4: Appraisal of Real Property in Application for Sale of Minor's Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketApplication Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn) : to Sell Minor Interest in Property jtomlin@dorsettjohnson.com Michellestewart_steno@outlook.com CR MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketWaiver Index # 3: of Right of De Novo Hearing Before Referring Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114991: Van Voast, Charissa: (232.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Van Voast, Charissa; Total Financial Assessment: 232.00; Total Payments and Credits: 232.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 232.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication to Sell Minor's Interest in Property 351.001 Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 1: Letter to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D Tomlin