Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 06:37:17 (UTC).

In the Estate of Roma Johnson Bowman, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 In the Estate of Roma Johnson Bowman, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06-2

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Lucas, Walter Homer

Thorndale, TX 76577

Decedent

Bowman, Roma Johnson

Watauga, TX 76148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jocelyn L. Irby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (2:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115410: Lucas, Walter Homer: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Lucas, Walter Homer; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 4/19/21; Public Notice: Served: 04/08/2021; Returned: 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jocelyn L. Irby