Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/21/2021 at 06:10:59 (UTC).

In the Estate of Robert Lewis Fisher, Deceased

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 In the Estate of Robert Lewis Fisher, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65-1

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Fisher, Robert Lewis

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Fisher, Bonnie Louise

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Reid A. Rector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-108578: Fisher, Bonnie Louise: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index #8: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (4:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-106509: Fisher, Bonnie Louise: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: Hearing Setting Letter October 13, 2020 4PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #4: Re Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 8/31/20; Public Notice: Served: 08/20/2020; Returned: 08/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-106293: Fisher, Bonnie Louise: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Fisher, Bonnie Louise; Total Financial Assessment: 260.00; Total Payments and Credits: 260.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Rector