This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 17:34:57 (UTC).

In The Estate of Ricky A. Texada, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In The Estate of Ricky A Texada, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Claimants

Truist Bank

800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

c/o Simm Associates, Inc.

Executor and Applicant

Texada, Cyd Patton Also Known As Texada, Cyd

Colleyville, TX 76034

Decedent

Texada, Ricky A. Also Known As Texada, Ricky

Colleyville, TX 76034

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor and Applicant Attorney

JOHN MATTHEW ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice Index # 16: Proof of Service of Notice to Secured Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialMail: Receipt # PR-0366630: Truist Bank: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Claimant Truist Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 14: Proof of Eservice of Notice Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Claim Index # 13: $3,979.64 - Eserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketClaim Index # 12: $3,979.64 - Acct. 3308

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: Tuesday, December 7, 2021 @ 11:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124486: Texada, Cyd Patton: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRequest Index # 4: Copy of Citation Post - emailed to atty 10-28-21 mo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124263: Texada, Cyd: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Texada, Cyd Patton; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 10/27/2021; Returned: 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O Simm Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY, JOHN MATTHEW