Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/26/2021 at 06:22:26 (UTC).

In The Estate of Ray Vaughan Stinson, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In The Estate of Ray Vaughan Stinson, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********76-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Stinson, Ray Vaughan

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Carter, Aaron Vaughan

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Applicants

Stinson, Hagen M.

Fort Worth, TX 76116

c/o Aaron Vaughan Carter

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Interested Party and Not Classified By Court

Carter, Aaron Vaughan

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Interested Party Attorneys

James W. Holliday

Shawna Young

Applicant Attorney

John V. Dowdy, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 9: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index # 11: First Amended Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Attorney Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0362666: Carter, Aaron Vaughan: (120.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Contestant Carter, Aaron Vaughan; Total Financial Assessment: 120.00; Total Payments and Credits: 120.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketContest - First Filing: Cntr/Cross/Interplea/Intervene/3P Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Carter, Aaron Vaughan: Served: 04/12/2021; Returned: 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 5: 817-624-3300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialPayment: Receipt # PR-0362411: Dowdy, John V., JR: (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115006: STINSON, HAGEN M.: (495.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Stinson, Hagen M.; Total Financial Assessment: 545.00; Total Payments and Credits: 545.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 04/26/2021 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 04/12/2021; Returned: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/26/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 4: to Attorney Re Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship Index # 1: and Petition for Declaratory Judgment, Owes $2 JF, Pd $24 Poster, Pd $75 Constabel, Pd $129 Pub, Pd $31 Non CC, Pd $4 Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawna Young