Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/10/2018 at 04:17:40 (UTC).

In the Estate of Philip Henry Sheridan, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Philip Henry Sheridan, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Sheridan, Stephen Michael

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Decedent

Sheridan, Philip Henry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

CHARLES TUPPER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Affidavit of 308 Notice Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Inventory Appraisement and List of Claims Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#11: Probate of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#10: Ind. Exec. w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (11:00 AM) () : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $40.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-83321: Sheridan, Philip Henry: (29.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Financial Information: Decedent Sheridan, Philip Henry; Total Financial Assessment: 29.00; Total Payments and Credits: 29.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341738: TUPPER, CHARLES: (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney TUPPER, CHARLES; Total Financial Assessment: 3.00; Total Payments and Credits: 3.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-80401: Sheridan, Stephen Michael: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79667: Sheridan, Stephen Michael: (300.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Sheridan, Stephen Michael; Total Financial Assessment: 302.00; Total Payments and Credits: 302.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less