This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 00:12:10 (UTC).

In The Estate of Petra R. Levrie, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 In The Estate of Petra R Levrie, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Vanskike, Robert Lee

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Decedents

Levrie, Petra R. Also Known As Levrie, Patra Rebakak

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Levrie, Petra R. Also Known As Levrie, Petra Rebakak

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Amanda M. Rowe

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAffidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-129465: Vanskike, Robert Lee: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRequest Index # 9: for 5 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-128901: Vanskike, Robert Lee: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof Index # 7: Addendum Qualifications

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (11:10 AM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.) : Zoom Email arowe@rowefirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-127212: Vanskike, Robert Lee: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 4: 02/14/2022 @11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-126408: Vanskike, Robert Lee: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Vanskike, Robert Lee; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/27/2021; Public Notice: Served: 12/16/2021; Returned: 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda M. Rowe