This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/05/2021 at 06:10:38 (UTC).

In the Estate of Penny Elizabeth Morgan, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Penny Elizabeth Morgan, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Morgan, Penny Elizabeth

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicants and Administrator With Will Annexed

Sheffield, Brandi

Morgan, Brandi D. Also Known As Morgan, Brandi Dawn Also Known As Sheffield, Brandi

Haltom City, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

Michael Kaitcer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114906: Morgan, Brandi D.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114831: Morgan, Brandi D.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOath Index #15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Admitting Will - Appoint Indep Admin w/ Will Annexed Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOath Index #14: Needs New Oath - Do Not Use

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (3:10 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email mkaitcer@whitakerchalk.com

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: Hearing Setting Letter 03/23/2021 at 3:10 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113818: Sheffield, Brandi: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Morgan, Brandi D.; Total Financial Assessment: 274.00; Total Payments and Credits: 274.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Index #1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Kaitcer