Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/01/2021 at 06:10:43 (UTC).

In the Estate of Oscar Kinchelo Glass, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 In the Estate of Oscar Kinchelo Glass, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Glass, Oscar Kinchelo

Kennedal, TX 76060

Applicant

DeLoach, Melissa

Waxahachie, TX 75167

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Thomas F. Dunn

Applicant Attorney

Jennifer L. Lovelace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketIndependent Admin with Determination of Heirship Hearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 10: June 23, 2021 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 9: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 6: 817-459-0000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114485: DeLoach, Melissa: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Glass, Oscar Kinchelo; Total Financial Assessment: 385.00; Total Payments and Credits: 385.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 03/29/2021 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 03/24/2021; Returned: 03/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/29/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/18/2021; Returned: 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 5: to Attorney Re Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 3: and Waiver of Notice - Stephanie Chesser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 2: and Waiver of Notice - Melissa DeLoach

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters, Pd $129 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L. Lovelace