This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/24/2021 at 06:05:46 (UTC).

In the Estate of Orina Christine Nichols, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In the Estate of Orina Christine Nichols, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********10-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant

Nichols, Michael Ladd

St Augustine, FL 32095

Decedent

Nichols, Orina Christine

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Robert J. Gieb

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAppt of Resident Agent Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: December 15, 2021 @ 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124237: Nichols, Orina Christine: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Nichols, Orina Christine; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/08/21; Public Notice: Served: 10/25/2021; Returned: 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Paid $4 JF $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Gieb