Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/07/2018 at 07:10:57 (UTC).

In the Estate of Orgie Dale Fullwood, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 In the Estate of Orgie Dale Fullwood, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Claimants

C/O RMP Services, LLC

200 N. New Road

Waco, TX 76710

Texas Oncology, CBO

Waco, TX 76710

Applicants and Administrator With Will Annexed

Williams, Terry L., SR

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Williams, Terry L., SR Also Known As Williams, Terry L. Also Known As Williams, Terry, SR

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Fullwood, Orgie Dale

Unknown, TX 11111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

Tawana H. Gray

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Doc ID#22: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Amended Inventory Appraisement and List of Claims Doc ID#21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Notice Doc ID#20: of Address Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Affidavit of 308 Notice Doc ID#18: Terry Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#17: To Counsel From Analyst Re: Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Inventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Claim Doc ID#15: $2,734.81 - Notice Letter Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#14: Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2: Holographic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Application for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Doc ID#1: Owes $2 JF, Pd $2 JF, Pd $6 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79626: Fullwood, Orgie Dale: (264.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Financial Information: Decedent Fullwood, Orgie Dale; Total Financial Assessment: 264.00; Total Payments and Credits: 264.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 264.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Mail: Receipt # PR-0342922: Texas Oncology, CBO: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Financial Information: Claimant Texas Oncology, CBO; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342046: Gray, Tawana H.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342045: Gray, Tawana H.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Gray, Tawana H.; Total Financial Assessment: 4.00; Total Payments and Credits: 4.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tawana H. Gray