Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/22/2018 at 10:47:22 (UTC).

In the Estate of Odessa Nichols, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Odessa Nichols, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Brooke U and Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Brooke U

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Decedent

Nichols, Odessa Also Known As Nichols, Odessa Lee

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Jones, Pamela Joyce Nichols Also Known As Nichols, Pamela Joyce

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jimalee H. Splawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#10: CC Will & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#9: Comp Aff. Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#7: Hearing 2/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: Re: to Original Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341813: Splawn, Jimalee H.: (17.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Splawn, Jimalee H.; Total Financial Assessment: 17.00; Total Payments and Credits: 17.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-80003: Jones, Pamela Joyce Nichols: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79656: Jones, Pamela: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Jones, Pamela Joyce Nichols; Total Financial Assessment: 260.00; Total Payments and Credits: 260.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimalee H. Splawn