This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/21/2018 at 09:56:55 (UTC).

In the Estate of Norris Jay Brickley, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 In the Estate of Norris Jay Brickley, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Brickley, Patricia Marie

Keller, TX 76248

Decedent

Brickley, Norris Jay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorneys

Lucien Stephen Franscini

L. Stephen Franscini, V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#10: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (4:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed: Indiana will-Mot for Judicial Notice of foreign law on file/Comp aff waived/declination needed by 2Exe-emailed atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Waiver of Citation/Service Doc ID#8: and Deliclination to Serve - Raymond Carl Brickley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Waiver of Citation/Service Doc ID#7: and Declination to Serve - Patty Icenogle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Motion Doc ID#5: Motion for Judicial Notice of Foreign Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 03/26/2018 - RFC 03/09/18 #23045773; Public Notice: Served: 03/14/2018; Returned: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343073: Griffith, Ross P.: (13.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81503: Brickley, Patricia Marie: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Brickley, Patricia Marie; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucien Stephen Franscini