This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/25/2021 at 06:35:09 (UTC).

In the Estate of Nina Jo Baker, Deceased

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 In the Estate of Nina Jo Baker, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67-1

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Baker, Nina Jo

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Applicant and Administrator

Baker, Stacy C. Also Known As Baker, Stacy Christian

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Interested Party

Baker, Wesley Craig

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Kaitlin Jo Philley

Applicant and Administrator Attorney

Nelda F. Harris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSworn Statement of Fees and Expenses Index # 24: $400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 21: Letter to Clerks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketIndependent Admin with Determination of Heirship Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Depend Admin & Determ Heirship Index # 19: $42,000 Bond Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 18: September 8, 2021 @ 3 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-120788: Baker, Stacy C.: (86.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 86.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 6: Waiver of Citation and Bond Makala Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 5: Waiver of Citation and Bond Stacey Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 4: Waiver of Citation and Bond Jason Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 05/10/2021 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 05/05/2021; Returned: 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 05/10/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/28/2021; Returned: 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-116280: BAKER, STACY C: (413.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Administrator Baker, Stacy C.; Total Financial Assessment: 501.00; Total Payments and Credits: 501.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 413.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: Clerk's E-mail to Attorney requesting Attorney Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $10 Letters, Pd $4 Non CC, Pd $10 CC, Pd $129 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nelda F. Harris