This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/16/2022 at 10:22:35 (UTC).

In the Estate of Nelda Jean Evans, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 In the Estate of Nelda Jean Evans, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

Richerson, Julie Kay

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Decedent

Evans, Nelda Jean

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Matthew L. Davidson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return 8-15-2022 also posted on OCA Website; Public Notice: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-136237: Richerson, Julie Kay: (83.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 7: and Waiver of Citation - Pam Whiteside

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAmended Appl for Indep Admin & To Determine Heirship Index # 6: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0367894: Davidson, Matthew L.: (16.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketReturn of Citation/Service Index # 5: Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-129205: Richerson, Julie Kay: (334.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Richerson, Julie Kay; Total Financial Assessment: 570.00; Total Payments and Credits: 570.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 471.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 03/07/2022 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/07/2022; Public Notice: Served: 02/24/2022; Returned: 02/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 4: Clerk's E-mail to Attorney requesting Attorney Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: Letter to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 2: Owes $4 JF and Letters, Pd $83 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Davidson