Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/02/2018 at 03:50:09 (UTC).

In the Estate of Nancy O'Neill Vick, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 In the Estate of Nancy O'Neill Vick, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********97-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Vick, Nancy O'Neill Also Known As Vick, Nancy O.

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Applicant

Vick, Linda J.

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Michael G. Appleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • CANCELED: Muniment of Title Hearing; (3:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) ; Per Attorney; "Over 4 Years"-only heir survived but now decd 2017-PR03401-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#9: Filing Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Hearing Setting Letter Doc ID#8: Hearing 01/29/18 @ 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date: 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#6: J. Michael McBride

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#5: Filing Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Paid $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79601: Vick, Nancy O'Neill: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Financial Information: Decedent Vick, Nancy O'Neill; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G. Appleman