This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 07:10:25 (UTC).

In The Estate of Nancy JoAnn Claunch, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 In The Estate of Nancy JoAnn Claunch, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Claunch, Alex Jay

Burleson, TX 76028

Decedent

Claunch, Nancy JoAnn

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Kelly E. DeBerry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 8: without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-132684: Claunch, Alex Jay: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: June 13, 2022 @ 2 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index # 5: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-131978: Claunch, Alex Jay: (263.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Claunch, Alex Jay; Total Financial Assessment: 402.00; Total Payments and Credits: 402.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 05/09/2022; Public Notice: Served: 04/27/2022; Returned: 04/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly E. DeBerry