Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 10/09/2018 at 23:50:33 (UTC).

In the Estate of Nadine Cleaves, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Nadine Cleaves, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Defendant

Wesson, Darnell, JR

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Applicant

Cleaves, Tommie Also Known As Cleaves, Tommmie Paul

Arlington, TX 76002

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Cleaves, Nadine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

G. Stanley Cramb

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ROY GOLSAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#24: Judgment Determining Heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Order for Payment of Attorney Fees Doc ID#23: $400 - Registry Pay - Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Judgment Determining Heirship Doc ID#22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#21: Thelma Cleaves

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#20: Kenicia Samples

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#19: Tommie Cleaves

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Determination of Heirship Hearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed: CRAMB/GOLSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#25: Filing Letter for Judgment Declaring Heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Report of Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Answer Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#17

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/15/2018 RFC 21397831 12/21/2017 8:56 AM; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Original Petition Doc ID#1: Suit to Declare Heirship; Suit to Partition Real Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343938: Cramb, G. Stanley: (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Ad Litem GOLSAN, ROY; Total Financial Assessment: 9.00; Total Payments and Credits: 9.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-80835: Cleaves, Tommie: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79685: Cleaves, Tommie: (395.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Cleaves, Tommie; Total Financial Assessment: 397.00; Total Payments and Credits: 397.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roy Golsan