Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/19/2018 at 10:10:53 (UTC).

In the Estate of Myrtle Lorene White, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 In the Estate of Myrtle Lorene White, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********87-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Decedent

White, Myrtle Lorene Also Known As White, Lorene

Azle, TX 76020

Applicant

White, Rodney

Azle, TX 76020

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Marcy Janise Pinkston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • Affidavit of Compliance Doc ID#10: Rodney White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#9: Issued 2 Will & Order Pd JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#8: Affidavit of Compliance is required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (4:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed: Comp aff required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Waiver of Citation/Service Doc ID#6: Greg White

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/19/2017; Returned: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342542: Pinkston, Marcy Janise: (26.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79579: White, Rodney: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant White, Rodney; Total Financial Assessment: 282.00; Total Payments and Credits: 282.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less