Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/04/2021 at 21:34:59 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mignonne P. Kagy, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 In the Estate of Mignonne P Kagy, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicants and Executors

Kagy, Jr., Robert D.

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Kagy, Jr., Robert D. Also Known As Kagy, Robert D.

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Decedent

Kagy, Mignonne P. Also Known As Kagy, Mignon P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Reid A. Rector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #11: Notice to Creditors - Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112757: Kagy, Jr., Robert D.: (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketRequest Index #10: to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112607: Kagy, Jr., Robert D.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #7: without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOath Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111142: Kagy, Jr., Robert D.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: February 1, 2021 at 2:20 pm via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-110989: Kagy, Jr., Robert D.: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Kagy, Jr., Robert D.; Total Financial Assessment: 280.00; Total Payments and Credits: 280.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 01/04/2020; Public Notice: Served: 12/23/2020; Returned: 12/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF Owes Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Rector