This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 06:06:26 (UTC).

In the Estate of Michael Troy Maddux, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In the Estate of Michael Troy Maddux, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44-2

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Maddux, Michael Troy

Saginaw, TX 76180

Not Classified By Court

Maddux, Adam

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Maddux, Callie Rae

Saginaw, TX 76131

Maddux, David

Richland Springs, TX 76871

Maddux, Jacob

Saginaw, TX 76131

Maddux, Sarah

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Maddux, Teresa Dolbin

Saginaw, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Laura Richardson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124251: Dolbin-Maddux, Teresa: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Maddux, Teresa Dolbin; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 10/27/2021; Returned: 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit Index # 10: Statement of Marital Relationship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit Index # 9: Birth Certificate Callie Rae Maddux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 8: Adam Nicholas Maddux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 7: Jacob Maddux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit Index # 6: Statement of Marital Relationship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit Index # 5: Statement of Marital Relationship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 4: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 3: David Maddux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 2: Sarah Maddux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index # 1: and Petition for Declaratory Judgment on the Existence of a Common Law Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less