This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 15:08:55 (UTC).

In The Estate of Michael Ray Burdette, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 In The Estate of Michael Ray Burdette, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********56-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Executor and Applicant

Charboneau, Christina Brooke

Madison, WI 53719

Decedents

Burdette, Michael Ray

Haltom City, TX 76148

Burdette, Michael Ray Also Known As Burdette, Michael

Haltom City, TX 76148

Not Classified By Court

Miller, Robert T.

Bedford, TX 76021

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor and Applicant Attorney

Brooks P. Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0369760: Lynn, Brooks P.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 8: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:20 AM) (Judicial Officer Allen, Brooke U.) : Zoom Email brooks@brookslynnlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-134788: Charboneau, Christina Brooke: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 7: 07/05/22 at 10:20 am zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/11/2022; Public Notice: Served: 03/31/2022; Returned: 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-130875: Charboneau, Christina Brooke: (263.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Charboneau, Christina Brooke; Total Financial Assessment: 404.00; Total Payments and Credits: 404.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAppt of Resident Agent Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 4: and Waiver of Notice Christina Brook Charboneau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF $8 letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks P. Lynn